U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-03065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fulton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • November 23, 2022: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.