U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v.McClelland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • January 05, 2023: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • January 05, 2023: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 30, 2022: [Audio File]
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • November 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release - SEALED]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Transcript - Unredacted]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Audio File]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - Amended]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.