U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ali
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • December 14, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • December 14, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2022: [Trial Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 23, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • June 15, 2022: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Forepersons Signature Page]
  • June 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.