U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Dat et al v. THE INDEPENDENT ORDER OF FORESTERS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • October 04, 2024: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 04, 2024: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Index]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement]
  • October 04, 2024: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • January 04, 2023: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Counterclaim]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 29, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.