U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00360
  • Case Name: HMM Co. Ltd. v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Summons Issued]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.