U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00427
  • Case Name: Payne v. Geer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Index]
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Index]
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.