U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parrott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Extend]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 04, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • January 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • September 29, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.