U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glaspie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.