U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gjergji
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Audio File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.