U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.