U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Board of Trustees of Omaha Construction Industry Pension Fund v. Kotas Enterprises, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 25, 2025: [In Court Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 18, 2025: [Contempt Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.