U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03085
  • Case Name: Busboom v. Morton Buildings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Counterclaim]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Return of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.