U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00179-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.