U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-03159
  • Case Name: Khalil v. The City of Lincoln
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate]
  • May 08, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.