U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-03045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Francis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Designated Clerk's Record]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Extend]
  • November 24, 2024: [New Trial]
  • November 04, 2024: [Proposed Witness List]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.