U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 17, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.