U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Panowicz v. Charter Health Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Index]
  • May 09, 2025: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.