U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Mead et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Letter]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Brief]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Index]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Index]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.