U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Union Pacific Railroad Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 05, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 05, 2025: [Jury Panel Record]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: [In Court Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Jury Pool Trial Report and SQs]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire Questions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Exhibit List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Index]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Reply Brief]
  • October 14, 2024: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 04, 2024: [Audio File]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.