U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cv-00178
  • Case Name: Ballard v. Thurman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 13, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Extend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.