U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Email Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Email]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 07, 2024: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.