U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia Vargas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Email]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.