U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cv-00339
  • Case Name: Elkhorn Valley Trucks, LLC v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Order on Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2024: [Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.