U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-03080-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayala-Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 10, 2025: [Downward Departure/Variance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 07, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 07, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 07, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.