U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • April 17, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • April 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Trial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.