U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.