U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Box
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Trial Order]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.