U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00195-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver]
  • March 13, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.