U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gulzow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Return of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Final or Preliminary Forfeiture]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Seal (Motion for Permission to Seal)]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Extend]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.