U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-03005
  • Case Name: Stockmens Bank v. Lime, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 02, 2025: [Index]
  • April 02, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Email]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Index]
  • March 12, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Affidavit]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.