U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Criminal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Right to Appeal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea and Plea Agreement Accepted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • March 27, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.