U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Schrieo v. A&A Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.