U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foreman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order for Progression of a Criminal Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.