U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wells
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.