U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reina Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Adoption of/Statement regarding Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript - Unredacted]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter by Clerk - Transcriber]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
  • March 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Findings and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • March 24, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 24, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.