U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luneke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Index]
  • March 14, 2025: [Quash]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.