U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03221
  • Case Name: Daws, Inc. v. Fernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.