U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-03228
  • Case Name: Schroeder et al v. Sool Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.