U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Himes v. Bryant
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 27, 2025: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.