U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Sentencing Schedule]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.