U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:23-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grap
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Receipt (Exhibit)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Report for Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Oral]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (MJs Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Petition for Offender Under Supervision (Prob 12C)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.