U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Baker v. CHI Nebraska
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.