U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:25-mj-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaimes-Diaz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Remark - Public]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Audio File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Consular Notification]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.