U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:24-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Text Only]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Oral]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.