U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-03001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sands
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 28, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 28, 2025: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 28, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Restrict pursuant to E-Goverment Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • April 21, 2025: [Restrict Pursuant to E-Government Act (Motion for Permission to Restrict)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Audio File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Petition regarding Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Pretrial Violation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Email Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Email]
  • April 14, 2025: [Restricted Hearing Instructions and Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 5 Pleadings - In]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.