U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hampton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Defendant/Case/Counts]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel CJA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.