open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:3:18-cv-00151
    Party Name:Mason v. Woods et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order Klingele]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Screening Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129900
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =