open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01582
    Party Name:Torres v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Intervene]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassign Judge]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulated Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?139144
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =