open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada

NEVADA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nevada
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01823
    Party Name:Rouse v. SMX - Staff Management et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulated/Consent Judgment]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nvd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?139845
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =