U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada

nevada Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00935-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landaverde
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation re discovery matters]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Stipulation re discovery matters]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel FPD]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.